Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cecil County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0080 /CH0339 (SB0132)
Title
Horse Racing at Fair Hill - Union Hospital Allocation - Repeal
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 (SB0442)
Title
Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0212 (SB0107)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges and Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Consent Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 /CH0171
Title
Cecil County - Natural Resources - Hunting
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540 (SB0511/CH0172)
Title
Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0802
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Adjustment to the Distribution of Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0997 /CH0709 (SB0259/CH0710)
Title
Cecil County – Special Taxing Districts – Internet Service
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1169 /CH0396 (SB0895)
Title
Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1407 /CH0016 (SB1040)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2019
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107 (HB0212)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges and Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Consent Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0132 (HB0080/CH0339)
Title
Horse Racing at Fair Hill - Union Hospital Allocation - Repeal
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0259 /CH0710 (HB0997/CH0709)
Title
Cecil County – Special Taxing Districts – Internet Service
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442 (HB0102)
Title
Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511 /CH0172 (HB0540)
Title
Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0895 (HB1169/CH0396)
Title
Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0080 /CH0339 (SB0132) Horse Racing at Fair Hill - Union Hospital Allocation - Repeal Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Ways and Means
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0102 (SB0442) Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0212 (SB0107) Anne Arundel County - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges and Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Consent Requirement Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0242 /CH0171 Cecil County - Natural Resources - Hunting Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0540 (SB0511/CH0172) Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0802 State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Adjustment to the Distribution of Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Repeal Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0840 Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0997 /CH0709 (SB0259/CH0710) Cecil County – Special Taxing Districts – Internet Service Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 709
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1169 /CH0396 (SB0895) Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Economic Matters
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
HB1407 /CH0016 (SB1040) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2019 Chair, Appropriations Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0107 (HB0212) Anne Arundel County - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges and Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Consent Requirement Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0132 (HB0080/CH0339) Horse Racing at Fair Hill - Union Hospital Allocation - Repeal Cecil County Senators 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0259 /CH0710 (HB0997/CH0709) Cecil County – Special Taxing Districts – Internet Service Cecil County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 710
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2019 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0442 (HB0102) Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0511 /CH0172 (HB0540) Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Finance
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0895 (HB1169/CH0396) Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Finance
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:19 PM