Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Cecil County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532 (SB0452)
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Payout Percentages, Distribution of Proceeds, and Building Restrictions
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0575 (SB0604)
Title
Cecil County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0579
Title
Cecil County - Snare Traps - Repeal of Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0582 (SB0294)
Title
Cecil County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Federal Facilities Redevelopment Areas
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Deer Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones - Prince George's County PG 402-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0655
Title
Local Elections - County Commissioner and County Boards of Education - District Voting
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0692 (SB0823)
Title
Cecil County - Board of Education - Member Terms and Compensation
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0693 (SB0799)
Title
Cecil County - Fishing - Restrictions
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0859 (SB0797)
Title
Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940
Title
Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1374
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0294 (HB0582)
Title
Cecil County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Federal Facilities Redevelopment Areas
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0604 (HB0575)
Title
Cecil County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0797 (HB0859)
Title
Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0799 (HB0693)
Title
Cecil County - Fishing - Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0823 (HB0692)
Title
Cecil County - Board of Education - Member Terms and Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0919 (HB1259)
Title
Horse Racing - Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0532 (SB0452) Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities - Payout Percentages, Distribution of Proceeds, and Building Restrictions Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0575 (SB0604) Cecil County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0579 Cecil County - Snare Traps - Repeal of Prohibitions Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Kramer) Adopted (23-20)
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0582 (SB0294) Cecil County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Federal Facilities Redevelopment Areas Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0615 Natural Resources - Sunday Deer Hunting and Archery Hunting Safety Zones - Prince George's County PG 402-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0655 Local Elections - County Commissioner and County Boards of Education - District Voting Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0692 (SB0823) Cecil County - Board of Education - Member Terms and Compensation Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0693 (SB0799) Cecil County - Fishing - Restrictions Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0859 (SB0797) Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0940 Gaming - Regulation of Fantasy Gaming Competitions and Implementation of Sports Wagering - Supplementary Appropriation Speaker 6 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1374 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0294 (HB0582) Cecil County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Federal Facilities Redevelopment Areas Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0604 (HB0575) Cecil County - Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0797 (HB0859) Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0799 (HB0693) Cecil County - Fishing - Restrictions Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0823 (HB0692) Cecil County - Board of Education - Member Terms and Compensation Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
SB0919 (HB1259) Horse Racing - Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:24 AM
Click to return on the top page