Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cemeteries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0013 /CH0081
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Perpetual Care Trust Funds and Preneed Trust Accounts - Regulation
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0404 (SB0577/CH0305)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - State Facilities - Cemeteries
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1236 (SB0580)
Title
Health - Reporting of Death and Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1239 (SB0775)
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Pre-Need Contracts and Unclaimed Cremains - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1444 (SB1037)
Title
Allegany County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution to Cumberland Historic Cemetery Organization
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0577 /CH0305 (HB0404)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - State Facilities - Cemeteries
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0580 (HB1236)
Title
Health - Reporting of Death and Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0775 (HB1239)
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Pre-Need Contracts and Unclaimed Cremains - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0835
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemeteries - Exemption from Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1003
Title
Business Regulation - Pet Cemeteries - Establishment and Operational Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1037 (HB1444)
Title
Allegany County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution to Cumberland Historic Cemetery Organization
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0013 /CH0081 Office of Cemetery Oversight - Perpetual Care Trust Funds and Preneed Trust Accounts - Regulation Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0404 (SB0577/CH0305) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - State Facilities - Cemeteries Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1236 (SB0580) Health - Reporting of Death and Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and Penalties Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
HB1239 (SB0775) Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Pre-Need Contracts and Unclaimed Cremains - Reporting and Audit Requirements Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1444 (SB1037) Allegany County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution to Cumberland Historic Cemetery Organization Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0577 /CH0305 (HB0404) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - State Facilities - Cemeteries Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0580 (HB1236) Health - Reporting of Death and Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and Penalties Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0775 (HB1239) Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Pre-Need Contracts and Unclaimed Cremains - Reporting and Audit Requirements Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0835 Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemeteries - Exemption from Regulation Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB1003 Business Regulation - Pet Cemeteries - Establishment and Operational Requirements Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1037 (HB1444) Allegany County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution to Cumberland Historic Cemetery Organization Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM