Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cemeteries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0190
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Crematories - Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0321 (SB0159)
Title
Funeral Establishments - Pre-Need Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 /CH0419
Title
Health - Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0491
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Conservation Cemeteries - Perpetual Care Trust Fund Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1062
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments - Care and Custody of Human Remains
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0129
Title
Criminal Law - Desecration of Human Remains - Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0159 (HB0321)
Title
Funeral Establishments - Pre-Need Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0433 /CH0349
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Disposition
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0678
Title
Debt Collection - Attachment and Execution - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0190 Office of Cemetery Oversight - State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Crematories - Fees Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0321 (SB0159) Funeral Establishments - Pre-Need Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0431 /CH0419 Health - Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and Penalties Delegate Parrott 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0491 Office of Cemetery Oversight - Conservation Cemeteries - Perpetual Care Trust Fund Requirements Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1062 State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments - Care and Custody of Human Remains Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0129 Criminal Law - Desecration of Human Remains - Penalty Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0159 (HB0321) Funeral Establishments - Pre-Need Contracts - Reporting and Audit Requirements Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0433 /CH0349 Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Disposition Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0678 Debt Collection - Attachment and Execution - Exemptions Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM