Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cemeteries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235
Title
Abandoned Private Cemeteries - Repair or Maintenance by County or Municipality
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0693 (SB0642)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Investigations and Subpoenas - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0726
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1165
Title
Estates - Duties of Guardian of the Person - Fostering and Preserving Family Relationships
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0050 /CH0477
Title
Cemeteries - Authority to Maintain and Repair Memorials and Monuments
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0192
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0642 (HB0693)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Investigations and Subpoenas - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0235 Abandoned Private Cemeteries - Repair or Maintenance by County or Municipality Delegate Knotts 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0693 (SB0642) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Investigations and Subpoenas - Revisions Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0726 Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - Requirements Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1165 Estates - Duties of Guardian of the Person - Fostering and Preserving Family Relationships Delegate Saab 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0050 /CH0477 Cemeteries - Authority to Maintain and Repair Memorials and Monuments Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 477
Finance
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0192 Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - Requirements Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0642 (HB0693) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Investigations and Subpoenas - Revisions Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM