Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cemeteries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0877 /CH0506 (SB1242/CH0507)
Title
Burial Sites – Access, Required Consultation, and Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1483 /CH0287
Title
Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0329
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Brewer Hill Cemetery
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1242 /CH0507 (HB0877/CH0506)
Title
Burial Sites – Access, Required Consultation, and Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0877 /CH0506 (SB1242/CH0507) Burial Sites – Access, Required Consultation, and Tax Credit Delegate Knotts 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB1483 /CH0287 Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Visitation Delegate Saab 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0329 Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Brewer Hill Cemetery Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 11:00 AM
SB1242 /CH0507 (HB0877/CH0506) Burial Sites – Access, Required Consultation, and Tax Credit Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 507
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM