Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cemeteries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0489 (SB0434)
Title
Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0434 (HB0489)
Title
Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1048
Title
Real Property – Recorded Covenants – Substantially Changed Circumstances
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0489 (SB0434) Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
SB0434 (HB0489) Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1048 Real Property – Recorded Covenants – Substantially Changed Circumstances Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:19 PM