Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Cemeteries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0243 (SB0483)
Title
Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1179
Title
Public Health - Unborn Human Beings and Infants (Humane Disposition of Human Remains Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1512
Title
Historic African American Cemeteries Preservation Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0104
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0483 (HB0243)
Title
Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0917
Title
Transport of a Body After Anatomical Gift - Fees - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0243 (SB0483) Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1179 Public Health - Unborn Human Beings and Infants (Humane Disposition of Human Remains Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1512 Historic African American Cemeteries Preservation Fund Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0084 Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2020 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0104 Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - Requirements Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
1/30/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0483 (HB0243) Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0917 Transport of a Body After Anatomical Gift - Fees - Prohibition Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/14/2020 5:28 PM