Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Census -see also- Data; Demographics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0043 (SB0090)
Title
Elections - Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment - Commission and Process
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067
Title
Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0320 (SB0455)
Title
2020 Census Complete Count Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 (SB0039/CH0074)
Title
Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144 /CH0564 (SB0964)
Title
County Boards of Education - Equal Access to Public Services for Individuals With Limited English Proficiency
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1206 /CH0729
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Data Matching
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0039 /CH0074 (HB0528)
Title
Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 (HB0043)
Title
Elections - Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment - Commission and Process
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0455 (HB0320)
Title
2020 Census Complete Count Commission
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 /CH0211 (HB1260)
Title
Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0964 (HB1144/CH0564)
Title
County Boards of Education - Equal Access to Public Services for Individuals With Limited English Proficiency
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1004 /CH0770
Title
Election Law - Election Calendar and Processes - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0043 (SB0090) Elections - Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment - Commission and Process Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0067 Potomac Compact for Fair Representation Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0320 (SB0455) 2020 Census Complete Count Commission Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0528 (SB0039/CH0074) Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting Delegate Smith 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1144 /CH0564 (SB0964) County Boards of Education - Equal Access to Public Services for Individuals With Limited English Proficiency Delegate Lehman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
Ways and Means
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1206 /CH0729 Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Data Matching Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 729
Ways and Means
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0039 /CH0074 (HB0528) Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0090 (HB0043) Elections - Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment - Commission and Process President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0455 (HB0320) 2020 Census Complete Count Commission Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0581 /CH0211 (HB1260) Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2019 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0964 (HB1144/CH0564) County Boards of Education - Equal Access to Public Services for Individuals With Limited English Proficiency Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1004 /CH0770 Election Law - Election Calendar and Processes - Revisions Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 770
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:19 PM