Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Charles County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0446 /CH0178 (SB0909/CH0177)
Title
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457 /CH0134 (SB0347/CH0135)
Title
Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0233 (SB0416/CH0232)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0649 /CH0085 (SB0569/CH0084)
Title
Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Priority Funding Areas
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0709 (SB0612)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Farming 4 Hunger Community Agricultural Facility
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0710 /CH0418
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness Certification
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0712 /CH0138
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling to Underage Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland Carousel
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0788 /CH0460 (SB0844)
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting - Deer Management Permits
Sponsor
Eastern Shore Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 /CH0419
Title
Charles County - Garbage Disposal Services - Provider Displacement
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1344 (SB0182/CH0010)
Title
Baltimore City and Charles, Prince George's, and Harford Counties - Recall of Former Judge for Temporary Assignment - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0100
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland Studies Center
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0182 /CH0010 (HB1344)
Title
Baltimore City and Charles, Prince George's, and Harford Counties - Recall of Former Judge for Temporary Assignment - Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0300
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Maryland Veterans Memorial Museum Land Acquisition
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0347 /CH0135 (HB0457/CH0134)
Title
Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0416 /CH0232 (HB0472/CH0233)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0569 /CH0084 (HB0649/CH0085)
Title
Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Priority Funding Areas
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0612 (HB0709)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Farming 4 Hunger Community Agricultural Facility
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0800
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Medical Cannabis Grower Licenses - Review of Applications
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0909 /CH0177 (HB0446/CH0178)
Title
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0446 /CH0178 (SB0909/CH0177) Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0457 /CH0134 (SB0347/CH0135) Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0472 /CH0233 (SB0416/CH0232) Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0649 /CH0085 (SB0569/CH0084) Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Priority Funding Areas Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0709 (SB0612) Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Farming 4 Hunger Community Agricultural Facility Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
HB0710 /CH0418 Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness Certification Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0712 /CH0138 Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling to Underage Individual - Penalties Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0720 Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland Carousel Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
HB0788 /CH0460 (SB0844) Natural Resources - Hunting - Deer Management Permits Eastern Shore Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1300 /CH0419 Charles County - Garbage Disposal Services - Provider Displacement Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1344 (SB0182/CH0010) Baltimore City and Charles, Prince George's, and Harford Counties - Recall of Former Judge for Temporary Assignment - Eligibility Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Judiciary
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0100 Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland Studies Center Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 9:00 AM
SB0182 /CH0010 (HB1344) Baltimore City and Charles, Prince George's, and Harford Counties - Recall of Former Judge for Temporary Assignment - Eligibility Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0300 Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Maryland Veterans Memorial Museum Land Acquisition Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0347 /CH0135 (HB0457/CH0134) Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel Charles County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0416 /CH0232 (HB0472/CH0233) Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0569 /CH0084 (HB0649/CH0085) Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Priority Funding Areas Charles County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0612 (HB0709) Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Farming 4 Hunger Community Agricultural Facility Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 9:00 AM
SB0800 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Medical Cannabis Grower Licenses - Review of Applications Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0909 /CH0177 (HB0446/CH0178) Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials Charles County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM