Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Charles County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0287 /CH0306 (SB0461/CH0305)
Title
Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0530
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Indian Head Center for the Arts
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0536
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Indian Head Recreation Center
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0550 /CH0819
Title
Charles County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1085 (SB0749)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Farming 4 Hunger Community Agricultural Facility
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1258 (SB0884)
Title
Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Class D License – Transfer
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1723 /CH0625
Title
Charles County - Work Release - Collection of Inmate Earnings
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1737 (SB1266)
Title
Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0335
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Old Pomonkey High School
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0336
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Maryland Veterans Memorial Museum
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0452
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Velocity Center
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 /CH0305 (HB0287/CH0306)
Title
Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0749 (HB1085)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Farming 4 Hunger Community Agricultural Facility
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0884 (HB1258)
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Class D License - Transfer
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1157
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland Carousel
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1266 (HB1737)
Title
Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0287 /CH0306 (SB0461/CH0305) Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of Prohibition Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0530 Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Indian Head Center for the Arts Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB0536 Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Indian Head Recreation Center Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB0550 /CH0819 Charles County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 819
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1085 (SB0749) Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Farming 4 Hunger Community Agricultural Facility Delegate Proctor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 11:00 AM
HB1258 (SB0884) Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Class D License – Transfer Delegate Patterson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1723 /CH0625 Charles County - Work Release - Collection of Inmate Earnings Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Judiciary
3/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1737 (SB1266) Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0335 Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Old Pomonkey High School Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0336 Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Maryland Veterans Memorial Museum Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0452 Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Velocity Center Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0461 /CH0305 (HB0287/CH0306) Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of Prohibition Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0749 (HB1085) Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Farming 4 Hunger Community Agricultural Facility Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 9:00 AM
SB0884 (HB1258) Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Class D License - Transfer Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1157 Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland Carousel Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB1266 (HB1737) Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM