Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Charles County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0388 /CH0183
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - View of Licensed Premises
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0389 /CH0644
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0400
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Exemption From Off-Sale License Quota
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0438 /CH0653
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Golf Course Privilege
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1051
Title
Charles County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1358
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0058 /CH0130
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Board of Trustees and Elimination of District Agreements
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0845
Title
Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Requirements and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0947 /CH0097
Title
Calvert County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0973
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Membership and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0340 State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0388 /CH0183 Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - View of Licensed Premises Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0389 /CH0644 Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License Charles County Delegation 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 644
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0400 Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Exemption From Off-Sale License Quota Charles County Delegation 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0438 /CH0653 Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Golf Course Privilege Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 653
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0840 Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1051 Charles County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1358 Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0058 /CH0130 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Board of Trustees and Elimination of District Agreements Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2019 - 4:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0845 Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Requirements and Funding Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0947 /CH0097 Calvert County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0973 Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Membership and Funding Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:19 PM