Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Chartered Counties

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0129
Title
Staggered Election Terms - Charter County Councils
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0243 (SB0166)
Title
Land Use Actions - Legislative Bodies - Judicial Review
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352 /CH0261
Title
Office of Legislative Audits - Local School System Audits
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0663 (SB0580)
Title
Constitution - Local Government - Legal Notices
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0736
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1316 /CH0308
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 9 Limited Distillery Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0166 (HB0243)
Title
Land Use Actions - Legislative Bodies - Judicial Review
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0580 (HB0663)
Title
Constitution - Local Government - Legal Notices
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0779
Title
Land Use - Proposed Development Project - Transit and Traffic Adequacy Studies
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0129 Staggered Election Terms - Charter County Councils Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0243 (SB0166) Land Use Actions - Legislative Bodies - Judicial Review Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0352 /CH0261 Office of Legislative Audits - Local School System Audits Delegate Ghrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Appropriations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0663 (SB0580) Constitution - Local Government - Legal Notices Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0736 Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - Establishment Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1316 /CH0308 Alcoholic Beverages - Class 9 Limited Distillery Licenses Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0166 (HB0243) Land Use Actions - Legislative Bodies - Judicial Review Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0580 (HB0663) Constitution - Local Government - Legal Notices Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0779 Land Use - Proposed Development Project - Transit and Traffic Adequacy Studies Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM