Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Charters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0702 /CH0068 (SB0622/CH0067)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and Processing
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0875
Title
Education - Public Schools - Parent Empowerment
Sponsor
Delegate Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0882 (SB0578)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1140 /CH0528 (SB0697/CH0527)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Conversions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306
Title
Public Banking Institutions - Authorization and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0578 (HB0882)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0622 /CH0067 (HB0702/CH0068)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and Processing
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697 /CH0527 (HB1140/CH0528)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Conversions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0702 /CH0068 (SB0622/CH0067) Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and Processing Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0875 Education - Public Schools - Parent Empowerment Delegate Bates 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0882 (SB0578) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1140 /CH0528 (SB0697/CH0527) Corporations and Associations - Conversions Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1306 Public Banking Institutions - Authorization and Task Force Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0578 (HB0882) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0622 /CH0067 (HB0702/CH0068) Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and Processing Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0697 /CH0527 (HB1140/CH0528) Corporations and Associations - Conversions Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM
Click to return on the top page