Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Charters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0223 (SB0215/CH0019)
Title
Pilots - Recreational Vessels - Employment Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284 /CH0082
Title
Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Law or Charter Amendment Summary
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0682
Title
Municipalities - Charter Amendments - Referendum and Signatures Required for Petitions
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0809 (SB0540/CH0181)
Title
Municipalities - Parking Authorities
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0193
Title
Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Law or Charter Amendment Summary
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0215 /CH0019 (HB0223)
Title
Pilots - Recreational Vessels - Employment Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0540 /CH0181 (HB0809)
Title
Municipalities - Parking Authorities
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0104 Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
HB0223 (SB0215/CH0019) Pilots - Recreational Vessels - Employment Requirement Delegate Hammen 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0284 /CH0082 Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Law or Charter Amendment Summary Delegate Flanagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0682 Municipalities - Charter Amendments - Referendum and Signatures Required for Petitions Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0809 (SB0540/CH0181) Municipalities - Parking Authorities Delegate McMillan 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0193 Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Law or Charter Amendment Summary Senator Bates 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0215 /CH0019 (HB0223) Pilots - Recreational Vessels - Employment Requirement Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0540 /CH0181 (HB0809) Municipalities - Parking Authorities Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM