Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Chemical Tests

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0281 (SB0217)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Payment for Controlled Dangerous Substances Prescribed by Physicians - Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 (SB0594)
Title
Hepatitis C - Opportunity for Testing and Follow-Up Health Care
Sponsor
Delegate Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0773
Title
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Delegate DeBoy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1014
Title
Criminal Procedure - Preliminary Breath Test - Evidence
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1188
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Alcohol and Drug Testing - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0021
Title
Family Investment Program - Eligibility - Drug Testing
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 /CH0014
Title
Vehicle Laws - Commercial and Farm Vehicles - Safety Inspections and Utility Emergencies
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0217 (HB0281)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Payment for Controlled Dangerous Substances Prescribed by Physicians - Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0452
Title
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0594 (HB0543)
Title
Hepatitis C - Opportunity for Testing and Follow-Up Health Care
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0281 (SB0217) Workers' Compensation - Payment for Controlled Dangerous Substances Prescribed by Physicians - Limitations Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0543 (SB0594) Hepatitis C - Opportunity for Testing and Follow-Up Health Care Delegate Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0773 Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Delegate DeBoy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1014 Criminal Procedure - Preliminary Breath Test - Evidence Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1188 Law Enforcement Officers - Alcohol and Drug Testing - Required Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0021 Family Investment Program - Eligibility - Drug Testing Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
SB0077 /CH0014 Vehicle Laws - Commercial and Farm Vehicles - Safety Inspections and Utility Emergencies Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0217 (HB0281) Workers' Compensation - Payment for Controlled Dangerous Substances Prescribed by Physicians - Limitations Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0452 Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0594 (HB0543) Hepatitis C - Opportunity for Testing and Follow-Up Health Care Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM