Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Chesapeake Bay

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0056 /CH0611 (SB0013)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group and Transportation Facilities Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0078 /CH0044 (SB0172)
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0095 (SB0162)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0572 (SB0252)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Affected Counties - Infrastructure Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0841 (SB0573/CH0567)
Title
Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing – Sales Tax Sunset Extension and Study
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1059 (SB0950)
Title
Aquaculture Lease Applications - Notice, Protests, and Meetings - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1128
Title
Environment – Water Quality Certifications – Requests (Water Quality Certification Improvement Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1432
Title
Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation Network
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0003 (SJ0003)
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing - Wild-Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0013 (HB0056/CH0611)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0142 /CH0536
Title
Natural Resources - Recreational License Donation Program and Healing Hunting and Fishing Fund - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0252 (HB0572)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Affected Counties - Infrastructure Funding
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Chesapeake Bay Watershed States - Expenses and Contracts (Quit Polluting My Bay Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456
Title
Transportation - Third Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Study
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0573 /CH0567 (HB0841)
Title
Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing – Sales Tax Sunset Extension and Study
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0950 (HB1059)
Title
Aquaculture Lease Applications - Notice, Protests, and Meetings - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0003 (HJ0003)
Title
Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0056 /CH0611 (SB0013) Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group and Transportation Facilities Projects Delegate Arentz 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2020 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0078 /CH0044 (SB0172) Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses Delegate Watson, C. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 44
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2020 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0095 (SB0162) Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0572 (SB0252) Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Affected Counties - Infrastructure Funding Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0841 (SB0573/CH0567) Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing – Sales Tax Sunset Extension and Study Delegate Chang 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1059 (SB0950) Aquaculture Lease Applications - Notice, Protests, and Meetings - Alterations Delegate Clark 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1128 Environment – Water Quality Certifications – Requests (Water Quality Certification Improvement Act) Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1432 Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation Network Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HJ0003 (SJ0003) Natural Resources - Fishing - Wild-Caught Blue Catfish Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0013 (HB0056/CH0611) Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Finance
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0142 /CH0536 Natural Resources - Recreational License Donation Program and Healing Hunting and Fishing Fund - Revisions Senator Simonaire 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 536
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0252 (HB0572) Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Affected Counties - Infrastructure Funding Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0414 State Finance and Procurement - Chesapeake Bay Watershed States - Expenses and Contracts (Quit Polluting My Bay Act of 2020) Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0456 Transportation - Third Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Study Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0573 /CH0567 (HB0841) Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing – Sales Tax Sunset Extension and Study Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 567
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0950 (HB1059) Aquaculture Lease Applications - Notice, Protests, and Meetings - Alterations Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SJ0003 (HJ0003) Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:18 PM