Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Child Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133 (SB0159)
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 (SB0172/CH0464)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0229 /CH0391
Title
Public Health - Child Care Products Containing Flame-Retardant Chemicals - TDCPP - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0297 (SB0332/CH0002)
Title
Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0383
Title
Family Law - Unattended Child Under the Age of Three
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Lead Hazard Reduction Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Hogan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439 (SB0538)
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Excusal
Sponsor
Delegate Summers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706 (SB0984)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Silver Spring Learning Center Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0935 (SB0505)
Title
Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term Supports
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1276 /CH0332 (SB0716/CH0331)
Title
Child Care Centers - Healthy Eating and Physical Activity Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1373
Title
Environment - Permits to Construct or Materially Alter an Incinerator - Limitations on Issuance
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1383
Title
Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1456 /CH0457
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1522 /CH0461 (SB1107)
Title
Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Temporary Relocation
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0159 (HB0133)
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0180
Title
State Personnel - Child Day Care Financial Assistance Program
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0332 /CH0002 (HB0297)
Title
Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0363
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce - Settlement Agreement
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0505 (HB0935)
Title
Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term Supports
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538 (HB0439)
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Excusal
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0631
Title
Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0716 /CH0331 (HB1276/CH0332)
Title
Child Care Centers - Healthy Eating and Physical Activity Act
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0984 (HB0706)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Silver Spring Learning Center Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1107 (HB1522/CH0461)
Title
Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Temporary Relocation
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0133 (SB0159) Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0162 (SB0172/CH0464) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0229 /CH0391 Public Health - Child Care Products Containing Flame-Retardant Chemicals - TDCPP - Prohibition Delegate Hubbard 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0297 (SB0332/CH0002) Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0383 Family Law - Unattended Child Under the Age of Three Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0431 Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Lead Hazard Reduction Projects Delegate Hogan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
HB0439 (SB0538) Courts - Jury Service - Excusal Delegate Summers 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0706 (SB0984) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Silver Spring Learning Center Expansion Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2014 - 10:30 AM
HB0935 (SB0505) Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term Supports Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1276 /CH0332 (SB0716/CH0331) Child Care Centers - Healthy Eating and Physical Activity Act Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1373 Environment - Permits to Construct or Materially Alter an Incinerator - Limitations on Issuance Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1383 Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1456 /CH0457 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1522 /CH0461 (SB1107) Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Temporary Relocation Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0159 (HB0133) Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0180 State Personnel - Child Day Care Financial Assistance Program Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0332 /CH0002 (HB0297) Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0363 Family Law - Grounds for Divorce - Settlement Agreement Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0505 (HB0935) Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term Supports Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0538 (HB0439) Courts - Jury Service - Excusal Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0631 Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0716 /CH0331 (HB1276/CH0332) Child Care Centers - Healthy Eating and Physical Activity Act Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0984 (HB0706) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Silver Spring Learning Center Expansion Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 9:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2014 - 9:30 AM
SB1107 (HB1522/CH0461) Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - Exception for Temporary Relocation Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM