Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Child Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066 /CH0088
Title
Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0329 /CH0184 (SB0312/CH0183)
Title
Children - Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Advertising and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0681
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120
Title
Family Law - Automatic Injunction
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1391
Title
Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1484 (SB0015)
Title
Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1621 (SB0165)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Berean Child Care Center
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015 (HB1484)
Title
Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0165 (HB1621)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Berean Child Care Center
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0282 /CH0185
Title
Early Childhood Development - Transfer of Provisions
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305
Title
Family Child Care Providers - High School Diploma or GED Test
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0312 /CH0183 (HB0329/CH0184)
Title
Children - Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Advertising and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0358
Title
Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Parties With Minor Children
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0569
Title
Methadone Treatment Facilities - Location - Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898 (HB1418)
Title
Public Health - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine - Certification for Emergency Administration
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 /CH0088 Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - Repeal Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0329 /CH0184 (SB0312/CH0183) Children - Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Advertising and Penalties Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0681 Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1120 Family Law - Automatic Injunction Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1391 Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - Regulations Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1484 (SB0015) Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting Requirements Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1621 (SB0165) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Berean Child Care Center Delegate Oaks 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 12:00 PM
SB0015 (HB1484) Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting Requirements Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0165 (HB1621) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Berean Child Care Center Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 9:00 AM
SB0282 /CH0185 Early Childhood Development - Transfer of Provisions Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0305 Family Child Care Providers - High School Diploma or GED Test Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0312 /CH0183 (HB0329/CH0184) Children - Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Advertising and Penalties Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0358 Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Parties With Minor Children Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0569 Methadone Treatment Facilities - Location - Limitations Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0898 (HB1418) Public Health - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine - Certification for Emergency Administration Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM