Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Child Custody

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0068 (SB0444)
Title
Family Law - Denial of Custody or Visitation - Sexual Abuse of a Minor
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0236 (SB0208)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0315 /CH0096 (SB0396)
Title
Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or Guardianship
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760
Title
Family Law - Out-of-State Civil Unions - Applicability of Domestic Relations Laws
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0958 (SB0411)
Title
Rape Survivor Family Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1278
Title
Family Law - Protective Order Proceedings - Jurisdiction - Custody of Minor Child
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1301
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation Determinations
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1321
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission - Treatment, Certification, Licensing, and Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1440 (SB1004)
Title
Family Law - Children's Civil Rights - Equal Parenting Time
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1533
Title
Commission on Child Custody Decision Making - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0144 /CH0039
Title
Family Law - Foster Care - Kinship Parent Age Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208 (HB0236)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0363
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce - Settlement Agreement
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0396 (HB0315/CH0096)
Title
Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or Guardianship
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0411 (HB0958)
Title
Rape Survivor Family Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0444 (HB0068)
Title
Family Law - Denial of Custody or Visitation - Sexual Abuse of a Minor
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1004 (HB1440)
Title
Family Law - Children's Civil Rights - Equal Parenting Time
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0068 (SB0444) Family Law - Denial of Custody or Visitation - Sexual Abuse of a Minor Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0236 (SB0208) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0315 /CH0096 (SB0396) Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or Guardianship Delegate Anderson 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Judiciary
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0760 Family Law - Out-of-State Civil Unions - Applicability of Domestic Relations Laws Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0958 (SB0411) Rape Survivor Family Protection Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1007 Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1278 Family Law - Protective Order Proceedings - Jurisdiction - Custody of Minor Child Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1301 Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation Determinations Delegate Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1321 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission - Treatment, Certification, Licensing, and Registration Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB1440 (SB1004) Family Law - Children's Civil Rights - Equal Parenting Time Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1533 Commission on Child Custody Decision Making - Extension Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0144 /CH0039 Family Law - Foster Care - Kinship Parent Age Requirements Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0208 (HB0236) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0363 Family Law - Grounds for Divorce - Settlement Agreement Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0396 (HB0315/CH0096) Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or Guardianship Senator Jones-Rodwell 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0411 (HB0958) Rape Survivor Family Protection Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0444 (HB0068) Family Law - Denial of Custody or Visitation - Sexual Abuse of a Minor Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1004 (HB1440) Family Law - Children's Civil Rights - Equal Parenting Time Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM