Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Child Custody

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0171 (SB0150/CH0326)
Title
Courts - Child Abuse and Neglect - Waiver of Reunification Efforts (Anayah's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0220 (SB0273)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0347
Title
Courts - Child Abuse and Neglect - Waiver of Reunification Efforts
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348 (SB0468)
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0350
Title
Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0474
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0503 (SB0078)
Title
Rape Survivor Family Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0577 (SB0402)
Title
Family Law - De Facto Parent
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0888 (SB0650)
Title
Family Law - Rebuttable Presumption of Joint Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022 (SB0609)
Title
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1083 (SB0550)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1125 (SB0208)
Title
Family Law - Rehoming of Adopted Children
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1192
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation Determinations
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0078 (HB0503)
Title
Rape Survivor Family Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0150 /CH0326 (HB0171)
Title
Courts - Child Abuse and Neglect - Waiver of Reunification Efforts (Anayah's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208 (HB1125)
Title
Family Law - Rehoming of Adopted Children
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 (HB0220)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0402 (HB0577)
Title
Family Law - De Facto Parent
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0468 (HB0348)
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0472 /CH0353
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce - Mutual Consent
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0550 (HB1083)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0609 (HB1022)
Title
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0650 (HB0888)
Title
Family Law - Rebuttable Presumption of Joint Custody
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0171 (SB0150/CH0326) Courts - Child Abuse and Neglect - Waiver of Reunification Efforts (Anayah's Law) Delegate Afzali 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0220 (SB0273) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0347 Courts - Child Abuse and Neglect - Waiver of Reunification Efforts Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0348 (SB0468) Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0350 Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0474 Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0503 (SB0078) Rape Survivor Family Protection Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0577 (SB0402) Family Law - De Facto Parent Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0888 (SB0650) Family Law - Rebuttable Presumption of Joint Custody Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1022 (SB0609) State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Establishment Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1083 (SB0550) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1125 (SB0208) Family Law - Rehoming of Adopted Children Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1192 Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation Determinations Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0078 (HB0503) Rape Survivor Family Protection Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0150 /CH0326 (HB0171) Courts - Child Abuse and Neglect - Waiver of Reunification Efforts (Anayah's Law) Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0208 (HB1125) Family Law - Rehoming of Adopted Children Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0273 (HB0220) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0402 (HB0577) Family Law - De Facto Parent Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0468 (HB0348) Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0472 /CH0353 Family Law - Grounds for Divorce - Mutual Consent Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0550 (HB1083) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0609 (HB1022) State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot Program Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0650 (HB0888) Family Law - Rebuttable Presumption of Joint Custody Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM