Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Child Custody -see also- Parents and Guardians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0508
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0636 (SB0010)
Title
Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0812 (SB1032)
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1263 /CH0651 (SB0996/CH0652)
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Definitions
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010 (HB0636)
Title
Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0068
Title
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Cannabis
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0368
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0905
Title
Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time - Shared Parenting Time for Family Equality Act
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0996 /CH0652 (HB1263/CH0651)
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Definitions
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1032 (HB0812)
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1095
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0508 Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0636 (SB0010) Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0812 (SB1032) Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1263 /CH0651 (SB0996/CH0652) Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Definitions Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651
Judiciary
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0010 (HB0636) Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed Parents Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0068 Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Cannabis Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0368 Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0905 Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time - Shared Parenting Time for Family Equality Act Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0996 /CH0652 (HB1263/CH0651) Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Definitions Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1032 (HB0812) Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1095 Family Law - Child Support - Custody and Visitation Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM