Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Child Custody -see also- Parents and Guardians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1032 (SB0684)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1034
Title
Grounds for Divorce - Mutual Consent - Military Service Member
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1464
Title
Prince George's County - Truancy Violations - Reporting of Neglect PG 515-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1507
Title
Compulsory School Attendance - Truancy Violations - Reporting of Neglect
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1628
Title
Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0308 /CH0380 (HB0431/CH0379)
Title
Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684 (HB1032)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1238
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1032 (SB0684) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1034 Grounds for Divorce - Mutual Consent - Military Service Member Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1464 Prince George's County - Truancy Violations - Reporting of Neglect PG 515-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1507 Compulsory School Attendance - Truancy Violations - Reporting of Neglect Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1628 Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and Neglect Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0308 /CH0380 (HB0431/CH0379) Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018) President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0684 (HB1032) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1238 Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM