Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Child Custody -see also- Parents and Guardians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0170 (SB0581)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0191
Title
Child Support, Custody, and Visitation - Award of Expenses - Suit Money
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0269 (SB0579)
Title
Child Support - Shared Physical Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0311 (SB0101)
Title
Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839 (SB0539)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103 (SB0924)
Title
Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1114
Title
Child Custody and Visitation - Best Interest of the Child - Factors
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1328
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1337
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1602
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101 (HB0311)
Title
Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0539 (HB0839)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0579 (HB0269)
Title
Child Support - Shared Physical Custody
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 (HB0170)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0594
Title
Child Custody and Visitation - Abuse or Neglect of Child
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0665
Title
Family Law - Custody Evaluator - Information to Parties
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0924 (HB1103)
Title
Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0170 (SB0581) Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0191 Child Support, Custody, and Visitation - Award of Expenses - Suit Money Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
1/30/2020 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0269 (SB0579) Child Support - Shared Physical Custody Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0311 (SB0101) Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judiciary
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0839 (SB0539) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/24/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1103 (SB0924) Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1114 Child Custody and Visitation - Best Interest of the Child - Factors Delegate Charles 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1328 Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1337 Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1602 Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0101 (HB0311) Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
1/09/2020 - 2:15 PM
Judiciary
SB0539 (HB0839) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0579 (HB0269) Child Support - Shared Physical Custody Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0581 (HB0170) Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
SB0594 Child Custody and Visitation - Abuse or Neglect of Child Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0665 Family Law - Custody Evaluator - Information to Parties Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0924 (HB1103) Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 5:11 PM