Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Child Custody -see also- Parents and Guardians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0476
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0505
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0748 (SB0057)
Title
Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0893
Title
Foster Parents, Kinship Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Right to Intervene
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0973
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Branch, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1036 (SB0675)
Title
Child Custody – Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence – Training for Judges and Child’s Counsel
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1116
Title
Juvenile Law - Child Custodial Interrogation - Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0748)
Title
Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355
Title
Family Law – Custody Evaluators – Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 (HB1036)
Title
Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges and Child's Counsel
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774
Title
Family Law - Custody and Visitation - Child's Preference
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0775
Title
Family Law - Child Custody and Visitation - Abuse
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0476 Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0505 Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2021 - 1:45 PM
HB0748 (SB0057) Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0893 Foster Parents, Kinship Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Right to Intervene Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0973 Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Delegate Branch, C. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1036 (SB0675) Child Custody – Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence – Training for Judges and Child’s Counsel Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1116 Juvenile Law - Child Custodial Interrogation - Rights Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
SB0057 (HB0748) Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0355 Family Law – Custody Evaluators – Qualifications and Training Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0675 (HB1036) Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges and Child's Counsel Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0708 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0774 Family Law - Custody and Visitation - Child's Preference Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0775 Family Law - Child Custody and Visitation - Abuse Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 12:56 PM
Click to return on the top page