Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Children, Governor's Office for

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0823 /CH0545 (SB0764/CH0544)
Title
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1320 /CH0413
Title
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0764 /CH0544 (HB0823/CH0545)
Title
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0823 /CH0545 (SB0764/CH0544) Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545
Appropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1320 /CH0413 Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program - Extension Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0764 /CH0544 (HB0823/CH0545) Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM