Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Children, Governor's Office for

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0151 /CH0216
Title
Juvenile Services - Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program - Reporting Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0577 (SB1018)
Title
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0904 /CH0621
Title
Children, Youth, and Family Services - Local Management Boards and State Spending - Information Collection and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1018 (HB0577)
Title
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and Duties
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0151 /CH0216 Juvenile Services - Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program - Reporting Requirement Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Judiciary
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0577 (SB1018) Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and Duties Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0904 /CH0621 Children, Youth, and Family Services - Local Management Boards and State Spending - Information Collection and Report Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1018 (HB0577) Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and Duties Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM