Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Children, Governor's Office for

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066 /CH0088
Title
Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0089
Title
Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program - Composition
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1501
Title
Governor's Office for Children - Family Navigators Program
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 /CH0088 Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - Repeal Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0067 /CH0089 Maryland Infants and Toddlers Program - Composition Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Ways and Means
1/28/2016 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1501 Governor's Office for Children - Family Navigators Program Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page