Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Churches -see also- Religion

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0158 (SB0037)
Title
Carroll County - Gaming
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0329 /CH0097 (SB0615)
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Permits
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0433 /CH0405 (SB0619)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0831 /CH0347 (SB0846/CH0346)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0833 /CH0617
Title
Baltimore City - Tax-Exempt Property - Certification of Use
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840 (SB0347)
Title
Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0950 /CH0433
Title
Property Tax - Charitable, Educational, or Religious Properties - Tax on Formerly Exempt Property
Sponsor
Delegate Hogan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1135 (SB0899/CH0573)
Title
Kent County - Gaming - Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1140
Title
Local Gaming - Charitable Casino Events
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1362 (SB0010)
Title
Frederick County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1373
Title
Environment - Permits to Construct or Materially Alter an Incinerator - Limitations on Issuance
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1476 /CH0458
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2008 - Baltimore County - The Emmart-Pierpoint Safe House
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1498 (SB0498)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - SS Philip and James Church Hall Renovation and Repair
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010 (HB1362)
Title
Frederick County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0037 (HB0158)
Title
Carroll County - Gaming
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0347 (HB0840)
Title
Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0498 (HB1498)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - SS Philip and James Church Hall Renovation and Repair
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0615 (HB0329/CH0097)
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Permits
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0619 (HB0433/CH0405)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0673
Title
Calvert County - Discharge of a Firearm Near Buildings
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0828
Title
Baltimore County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0846 /CH0346 (HB0831/CH0347)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0899 /CH0573 (HB1135)
Title
Kent County - Gaming - Permits
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0158 (SB0037) Carroll County - Gaming Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke)
Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0329 /CH0097 (SB0615) Frederick County - Gaming Permits Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0433 /CH0405 (SB0619) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014 Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0831 /CH0347 (SB0846/CH0346) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014 Delegate Branch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0833 /CH0617 Baltimore City - Tax-Exempt Property - Certification of Use Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 617
Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0840 (SB0347) Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - Repeal Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0950 /CH0433 Property Tax - Charitable, Educational, or Religious Properties - Tax on Formerly Exempt Property Delegate Hogan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1135 (SB0899/CH0573) Kent County - Gaming - Permits Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1140 Local Gaming - Charitable Casino Events Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke)
Ways and Means
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1362 (SB0010) Frederick County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit Organizations Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1373 Environment - Permits to Construct or Materially Alter an Incinerator - Limitations on Issuance Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1476 /CH0458 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2008 - Baltimore County - The Emmart-Pierpoint Safe House Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1498 (SB0498) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - SS Philip and James Church Hall Renovation and Repair Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 9:00 AM
SB0010 (HB1362) Frederick County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit Organizations Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0037 (HB0158) Carroll County - Gaming Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-1)
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0347 (HB0840) Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - Repeal Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0498 (HB1498) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - SS Philip and James Church Hall Renovation and Repair Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 11:00 AM
SB0615 (HB0329/CH0097) Frederick County - Gaming Permits Senator Brinkley 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0619 (HB0433/CH0405) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014 Senator Brinkley 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0673 Calvert County - Discharge of a Firearm Near Buildings Calvert County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Judicial Proceedings
SB0828 Baltimore County - Slot Machines for Nonprofit Organizations Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0846 /CH0346 (HB0831/CH0347) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014 Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0899 /CH0573 (HB1135) Kent County - Gaming - Permits Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM