Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Churches -see also- Religion

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066
Title
Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093 /CH0065
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - 1-Day License for Schools, Places of Worship, and Youth Centers MC 10-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0095 /CH0066
Title
City of Gaithersburg - Licensed Alcoholic Beverages Restaurants - Distance from Churches or Other Places of Worship MC 23-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0137 /CH0492
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0274 /CH0234 (SB0510)
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Events
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0280
Title
Carroll County - Gaming Events
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0331
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0804 (SB0287)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Four Corners Community Outreach Site
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0901 (SB0734)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Gilead House Renovation
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1152
Title
Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155 (SB0906/CH0206)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth Centers
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1220 (SB0788)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Mt. Calvary United Methodist Church
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004 /CH0142
Title
Carroll County - Gaming Events
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Baltimore County - License Fees
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0287 (HB0804)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Four Corners Community Outreach Site
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Charles County and Queen Anne's County
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0510 (HB0274/CH0234)
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Events
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0734 (HB0901)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Gilead House Renovation
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0788 (HB1220)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Mt. Calvary United Methodist Church
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0818 /CH0054
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Baltimore City - Transfer or Issuance of Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0906 /CH0206 (HB1155)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth Centers
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 Human Services - No Wrong Door Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0093 /CH0065 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - 1-Day License for Schools, Places of Worship, and Youth Centers MC 10-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0095 /CH0066 City of Gaithersburg - Licensed Alcoholic Beverages Restaurants - Distance from Churches or Other Places of Worship MC 23-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0137 /CH0492 Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 492
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0274 /CH0234 (SB0510) Frederick County - Gaming Events Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0280 Carroll County - Gaming Events Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0331 Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0804 (SB0287) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Four Corners Community Outreach Site Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0901 (SB0734) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Gilead House Renovation Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 10:00 AM
HB1152 Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1155 (SB0906/CH0206) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth Centers Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1220 (SB0788) Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Mt. Calvary United Methodist Church Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 3:00 PM
SB0004 /CH0142 Carroll County - Gaming Events Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Budget and Taxation
1/15/2015 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0046 Alcoholic Beverages - Baltimore County - License Fees Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0287 (HB0804) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Four Corners Community Outreach Site Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 10:00 AM
SB0354 Alcoholic Beverages - Charles County and Queen Anne's County Senator Hershey 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0510 (HB0274/CH0234) Frederick County - Gaming Events Senator Hough 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0734 (HB0901) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Gilead House Renovation Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 11:00 AM
SB0788 (HB1220) Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Mt. Calvary United Methodist Church Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0818 /CH0054 Alcoholic Beverages - Baltimore City - Transfer or Issuance of Licenses Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0906 /CH0206 (HB1155) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth Centers Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM