Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cigarettes -see also- Smoking

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0147
Title
Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizure and Disposition
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182 /CH0086 (SB0098)
Title
Business Regulation - Other Tobacco Products Wholesalers - License Fee Exception for Cigarette Subwholesalers
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0660 (SB0827)
Title
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0683 (SB0700)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0684
Title
Tobacco-Free Schools Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1068 (SB0425)
Title
Commercial Law - Cigarette Sales Below Cost - Wholesale Markup
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270
Title
Health Care Facilities and Pharmacies - Sale of Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0069 /CH0174
Title
Tobacco Products - Tobacco Tax - Exemptions and Penalties
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0098 (HB0182/CH0086)
Title
Business Regulation - Other Tobacco Products - Wholesalers - License Fee Exception for Cigarette Subwholesalers
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0425 (HB1068)
Title
Commercial Law - Cigarette Sales Below Cost - Wholesale Markup
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0700 (HB0683)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0827 (HB0660)
Title
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0147 Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizure and Disposition Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0182 /CH0086 (SB0098) Business Regulation - Other Tobacco Products Wholesalers - License Fee Exception for Cigarette Subwholesalers Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Economic Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0660 (SB0827) Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013 Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0683 (SB0700) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0684 Tobacco-Free Schools Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1068 (SB0425) Commercial Law - Cigarette Sales Below Cost - Wholesale Markup Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1270 Health Care Facilities and Pharmacies - Sale of Tobacco Products - Prohibition Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0069 /CH0174 Tobacco Products - Tobacco Tax - Exemptions and Penalties Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0098 (HB0182/CH0086) Business Regulation - Other Tobacco Products - Wholesalers - License Fee Exception for Cigarette Subwholesalers Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
1/24/2013 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0425 (HB1068) Commercial Law - Cigarette Sales Below Cost - Wholesale Markup Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0700 (HB0683) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 PM
Finance
SB0827 (HB0660) Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013 Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM