Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cigarettes -see also- Smoking

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0030
Title
Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizures and Disposition
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0278
Title
Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0405
Title
Environment - Sales of Nonbiodegradable Cigarettes - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0443 (SB0589)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1070
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Cigarette Restitution Fund - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159 /CH0447
Title
Cigarettes - County Retail License Holder - Prohibited Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1208 (SB0866)
Title
Education - Suspension and Expulsion - Restrictions and Alternative Disciplinary Options
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1291
Title
Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Smoking Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1334
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking PG/MC 112-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1408
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Smoke-Free or Tobacco-Free Campuses - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Wood
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0288
Title
Public Schools - Smoking on the Grounds of School Property - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0325
Title
Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0589 (HB0443)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0735
Title
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0866 (HB1208)
Title
Education - Suspension and Expulsion - Restrictions and Alternative Disciplinary Options
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0030 Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizures and Disposition Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0278 Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0405 Environment - Sales of Nonbiodegradable Cigarettes - Prohibited Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0443 (SB0589) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1070 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Cigarette Restitution Fund - Report Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1159 /CH0447 Cigarettes - County Retail License Holder - Prohibited Sales Delegate Vitale 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Economic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1208 (SB0866) Education - Suspension and Expulsion - Restrictions and Alternative Disciplinary Options Delegate Swain 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1291 Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Smoking Devices - Prohibition Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1334 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking PG/MC 112-14 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1408 Public Institutions of Higher Education - Smoke-Free or Tobacco-Free Campuses - Funding Delegate Wood 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0288 Public Schools - Smoking on the Grounds of School Property - Prohibition Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0325 Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0589 (HB0443) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 PM
Finance
SB0735 Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0866 (HB1208) Education - Suspension and Expulsion - Restrictions and Alternative Disciplinary Options Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM