Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cigarettes -see also- Smoking

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0026
Title
Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Smoking Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 (SB0037)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0489 /CH0425 (SB0007)
Title
Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0585 /CH0438
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking MC/PG 109-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633
Title
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Use of Funds - Compliance With Watershed Implementation Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1015
Title
Public Health - Responsible Tobacco Retailing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0007 (HB0489/CH0425)
Title
Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0037 (HB0108)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0026 Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Smoking Devices - Prohibition Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0108 (SB0037) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0489 /CH0425 (SB0007) Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and Enforcement Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Finance
HB0585 /CH0438 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking MC/PG 109-15 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0633 Cigarette Restitution Fund - Use of Funds - Compliance With Watershed Implementation Plans Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1015 Public Health - Responsible Tobacco Retailing Act of 2015 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0007 (HB0489/CH0425) Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and Enforcement Senator Middleton 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
1/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Judiciary
SB0037 (HB0108) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM