Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cigarettes -see also- Smoking

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071 (SB0514)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0775
Title
Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0861
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices - Regulation and Taxation
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1115 /CH0732
Title
Montgomery County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee MC 12-16
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213
Title
Education - Broadening Options and Opportunity for Students and Teachers (BOOST) Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1618 (SB1144)
Title
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment Services
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114
Title
Health - Prohibition on Distribution of Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices to Minors - Civil Enforcement
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0514 (HB0071)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1144 (HB1618)
Title
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment Services
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0071 (SB0514) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0775 Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0861 Electronic Smoking Devices - Regulation and Taxation Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1115 /CH0732 Montgomery County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee MC 12-16 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 732
Economic Matters
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1213 Education - Broadening Options and Opportunity for Students and Teachers (BOOST) Program - Establishment Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1618 (SB1144) Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment Services Delegate Hammen 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Finance
SB0114 Health - Prohibition on Distribution of Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices to Minors - Civil Enforcement Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0514 (HB0071) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1144 (HB1618) Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment Services Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m. ( Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM