Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Citations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0057
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems and Work Zone Speed Control Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071
Title
Speed Monitoring Systems - Penalty for Erroneous Citations
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0082
Title
Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems - Penalty for Erroneous Citations
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0201
Title
District Court Electronic Citation Fund and Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0226 (SB0049/CH0266)
Title
Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 (SB0481/CH0173)
Title
Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Individual Under the Age of 21 Years
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0526
Title
Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Daily Calibration and Video Recordings
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0565
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Restitution
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929 /CH0491 (SB0652)
Title
Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1186
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1232 (SB0973)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Task Force on Pretrial Risk Assessment - Detainee Electronic Information Sharing System
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1273 (SB0986)
Title
Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1360
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Warning
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1494
Title
Criminal Procedure - Misdemeanors - Citations
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0049 /CH0266 (HB0226)
Title
Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0141 /CH0471
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Nonpayment of Environmental Citations
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0350 /CH0490
Title
Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0364 /CH0158
Title
Criminal Law - Possession of Marijuana - Civil Offense
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0481 /CH0173 (HB0275)
Title
Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Individual Under the Age of 21 Years
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652 (HB0929/CH0491)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Speed Monitoring Systems - Local Jurisdictions
Sponsor
Senator Robey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Electronic Toll Collection - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0920
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0986 (HB1273)
Title
Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors Prohibited
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0057 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems and Work Zone Speed Control Systems Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0071 Speed Monitoring Systems - Penalty for Erroneous Citations Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0082 Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems - Penalty for Erroneous Citations Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0201 District Court Electronic Citation Fund and Fee Delegate Mitchell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0226 (SB0049/CH0266) Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014 Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0275 (SB0481/CH0173) Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Individual Under the Age of 21 Years Delegate Reznik 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB0526 Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Daily Calibration and Video Recordings Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0565 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Restitution Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0929 /CH0491 (SB0652) Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014 Delegate Malone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Environmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1186 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2014 - 3:30 PM
HB1232 (SB0973) Criminal Procedure - Task Force on Pretrial Risk Assessment - Detainee Electronic Information Sharing System Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1273 (SB0986) Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors Prohibited Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1360 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Warning Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1494 Criminal Procedure - Misdemeanors - Citations Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0049 /CH0266 (HB0226) Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014 Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Economic Matters
SB0141 /CH0471 Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Nonpayment of Environmental Citations Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0350 /CH0490 Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014 Senator Brochin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0364 /CH0158 Criminal Law - Possession of Marijuana - Civil Offense Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0481 /CH0173 (HB0275) Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Individual Under the Age of 21 Years Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0652 (HB0929/CH0491) Motor Vehicles - Speed Monitoring Systems - Local Jurisdictions Senator Robey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0697 Maryland Transportation Authority - Electronic Toll Collection - Procedures Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0920 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0986 (HB1273) Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors Prohibited Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM