Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Citations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0105
Title
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia and Marijuana - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0404 (SB0279)
Title
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0410
Title
Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Application to Right Turns
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0489 /CH0425 (SB0007)
Title
Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0494
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0506 (SB0410/CH0168)
Title
Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic Safety
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615
Title
Parole and Probation - Sanctioning Prohibited - Citation
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0856 (SB0571)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and Training
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0865 (SB0140)
Title
Kent County - Tobacco Products Offenses - Citations Issued by Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 (SB0531)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1015
Title
Public Health - Responsible Tobacco Retailing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1130
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving Without a License or While License is Suspended - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1241 /CH0122
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls and Related Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0007 (HB0489/CH0425)
Title
Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0140 (HB0865)
Title
Kent County - Tobacco Products Offenses - Citations Issued by Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0229
Title
Calvert County - Sale or Distribution of Tobacco and Related Products - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0279 (HB0404)
Title
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0410 /CH0168 (HB0506)
Title
Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic Safety
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0517
Title
Criminal Law - Use and Possession of Marijuana and Drug Paraphernalia
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 (HB0911)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 (HB0856)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and Training
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755 /CH0380
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Central Committee Candidates
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0790
Title
Vehicle Laws - Right-of-Way Violations - Death or Serious Bodily Injury - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0105 Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia and Marijuana - Penalties Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-3)
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0404 (SB0279) Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0410 Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Application to Right Turns Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0489 /CH0425 (SB0007) Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and Enforcement Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Finance
HB0494 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0506 (SB0410/CH0168) Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic Safety Delegate Anderson 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0615 Parole and Probation - Sanctioning Prohibited - Citation Delegate Moon 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0856 (SB0571) Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and Training Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0865 (SB0140) Kent County - Tobacco Products Offenses - Citations Issued by Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0911 (SB0531) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1015 Public Health - Responsible Tobacco Retailing Act of 2015 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1130 Vehicle Laws - Driving Without a License or While License is Suspended - Penalties Delegate Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1241 /CH0122 Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls and Related Fees Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0007 (HB0489/CH0425) Electronic Cigarettes - Sale to Minors - Components, Supplies, and Enforcement Senator Middleton 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
1/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Judiciary
SB0140 (HB0865) Kent County - Tobacco Products Offenses - Citations Issued by Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0229 Calvert County - Sale or Distribution of Tobacco and Related Products - Civil Penalties Calvert County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0279 (HB0404) Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0410 /CH0168 (HB0506) Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic Safety Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0517 Criminal Law - Use and Possession of Marijuana and Drug Paraphernalia Senator Zirkin 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 4 of 2016
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0531 (HB0911) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0571 (HB0856) Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and Training Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0755 /CH0380 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Central Committee Candidates Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0790 Vehicle Laws - Right-of-Way Violations - Death or Serious Bodily Injury - Penalties Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM