Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Citations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0024
Title
Natural Resources - Forest, Park, and Wildlife Rangers - Parking Citations
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0263 /CH0683
Title
School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies - Repeal and Notification Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0377 (SB0940)
Title
Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil Offense
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0380 (SB0937)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Civil Offenses - Public Consumption and Possession of Open Container
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0408 (SB0477)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0488 (SB0798)
Title
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0495 (SB0154/CH0744)
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0536
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0781 /CH0343
Title
Retail Pet Stores - Animal Seller, Dog Cage Signs, and Records - Requirement Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947
Title
Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Presence Monitoring Systems - Authorization by Local Jurisdictions
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1185 (SB0928)
Title
Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1510
Title
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0081
Title
Interstate Boating Violator Compact
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0136
Title
Vehicle Laws - Parking Violations - Authority of Political Subdivisions
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154 /CH0744 (HB0495)
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0477 (HB0408)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0798 (HB0488)
Title
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0928 (HB1185)
Title
Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0937 (HB0380)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Civil Offenses - Public Consumption and Possession of Open Container
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0940 (HB0377)
Title
Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil Offense
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0946
Title
Gun-Free Higher Education Zones
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1033 /CH0617 (HB0702)
Title
Residential Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0024 Natural Resources - Forest, Park, and Wildlife Rangers - Parking Citations Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0263 /CH0683 School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Exclusion of Vehicle Rental Companies - Repeal and Notification Requirement Delegate Carr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 683
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2017 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0377 (SB0940) Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil Offense Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0380 (SB0937) Alcoholic Beverages - Civil Offenses - Public Consumption and Possession of Open Container Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0408 (SB0477) Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0488 (SB0798) Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0495 (SB0154/CH0744) Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0536 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Repeal Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0781 /CH0343 Retail Pet Stores - Animal Seller, Dog Cage Signs, and Records - Requirement Revisions Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0947 Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Presence Monitoring Systems - Authorization by Local Jurisdictions Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1185 (SB0928) Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1510 Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0081 Interstate Boating Violator Compact Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0136 Vehicle Laws - Parking Violations - Authority of Political Subdivisions Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Lee)
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0154 /CH0744 (HB0495) Vehicle Laws - School Bus Monitoring Cameras - Civil Penalty Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 744
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0477 (HB0408) Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0798 (HB0488) Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0928 (HB1185) Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0937 (HB0380) Alcoholic Beverages - Civil Offenses - Public Consumption and Possession of Open Container Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Judiciary
SB0940 (HB0377) Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil Offense Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0946 Gun-Free Higher Education Zones Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1033 /CH0617 (HB0702) Residential Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited Foreclosure Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 617
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM