Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Civil Rights Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0637 /CH0624 (SB0934)
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Notice Requirement - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1269 (SB0223)
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0223 (HB1269)
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB0637/CH0624)
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Notice Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1023
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0106 Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0637 /CH0624 (SB0934) Local Government Tort Claims Act - Notice Requirement - Exception Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Judiciary
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1269 (SB0223) Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0223 (HB1269) Human Relations - Discrimination by a Place of Public Accommodation - Enforcement and Remedies Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 (HB0637/CH0624) Local Government Tort Claims Act - Notice Requirement Senator Manno 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/11/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB1023 Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM