Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Civil Rights Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0461
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0935 (SB0823)
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights – Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1109
Title
State Government - Discrimination in Employment - Pregnancy and Childbirth
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1423 /CH0791
Title
State Personnel - Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1565 (SB1060)
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1596 /CH0738 (SB1010/CH0739)
Title
Disclosing Sexual Harassment in the Workplace Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581
Title
Victims and Witnesses – U Nonimmigrant Status – Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0823 (HB0935)
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 /CH0739 (HB1596/CH0738)
Title
Disclosing Sexual Harassment in the Workplace Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1060 (HB1565)
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0461 Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness Delegate Morales 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-3)
Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0935 (SB0823) Maryland Commission on Civil Rights – Civil Penalties Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1109 State Government - Discrimination in Employment - Pregnancy and Childbirth Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1423 /CH0791 State Personnel - Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Required Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 791
Appropriations
2/23/2018 - 2:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1565 (SB1060) Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1596 /CH0738 (SB1010/CH0739) Disclosing Sexual Harassment in the Workplace Act of 2018 Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 738
Economic Matters
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0581 Victims and Witnesses – U Nonimmigrant Status – Certification of Victim Helpfulness Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0823 (HB0935) Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1010 /CH0739 (HB1596/CH0738) Disclosing Sexual Harassment in the Workplace Act of 2018 Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 739
Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1060 (HB1565) Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM