Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Commission on Civil Rights

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0168 /CH0032
Title
Public Safety - Reporting of Hate Crimes
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0214 /CH0422 (SB0144/CH0421)
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 (SB0848)
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0307 /CH0041
Title
Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0317 (SB0271)
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0679 /CH0222 (SB0872)
Title
Workplace Harassment – Prohibitions, Liability, Enforcement, and Prevention Training
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0699
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Training Requirements - Hate Crimes
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0784
Title
Election Law - False Statements - Correction and Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1107 (SB0518)
Title
Discrimination in Employment - Pregnancy and Childbirth
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1262
Title
Human Relations – Employment Discrimination and Discriminatory Housing Practices – Time to File Complaint
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0144 /CH0421 (HB0214/CH0422)
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0271 (HB0317)
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0518 (HB1107)
Title
Discrimination in Employment - Pregnancy and Childbirth
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0848 (HB0295)
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0872 (HB0679/CH0222)
Title
Workplace Harassment - Prohibitions, Liability, and Enforcement
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0168 /CH0032 Public Safety - Reporting of Hate Crimes Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 32
Judiciary
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0214 /CH0422 (SB0144/CH0421) Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Judiciary
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0295 (SB0848) Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Ways and Means
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0307 /CH0041 Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Judiciary
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0317 (SB0271) Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0679 /CH0222 (SB0872) Workplace Harassment – Prohibitions, Liability, Enforcement, and Prevention Training Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Appropriations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
HB0699 Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Training Requirements - Hate Crimes Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0784 Election Law - False Statements - Correction and Prohibition Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1107 (SB0518) Discrimination in Employment - Pregnancy and Childbirth Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/11/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1262 Human Relations – Employment Discrimination and Discriminatory Housing Practices – Time to File Complaint Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0144 /CH0421 (HB0214/CH0422) Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0271 (HB0317) Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0518 (HB1107) Discrimination in Employment - Pregnancy and Childbirth Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0848 (HB0295) Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0872 (HB0679/CH0222) Workplace Harassment - Prohibitions, Liability, and Enforcement President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:20 PM