Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Commission on Civil Rights

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255 (SB0547)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Hospitals and Related Institutions - Discrimination Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0579 (SB0364)
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0703
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0728 (SB1007)
Title
Employment Discrimination – Time for Filing Complaints
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0959 /CH0620 (SB0872/CH0621)
Title
Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120 /CH0428 (SB0738)
Title
Health Care Providers – Discrimination in Provision of Services
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0364 (HB0579)
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0547 (HB0255)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Hospitals and Related Institutions - Discrimination Protections
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0738 (HB1120/CH0428)
Title
Health Care Providers and Health Benefit Plans - Discrimination in Provision of Services
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0872 /CH0621 (HB0959/CH0620)
Title
Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1007 (HB0728)
Title
Employment Discrimination and Discriminatory Housing Practices - Time for Filing Complaints
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0255 (SB0547) Health Care Facilities - Hospitals and Related Institutions - Discrimination Protections Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0579 (SB0364) Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0703 Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Employment Discrimination - Reporting Delegate Qi 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0728 (SB1007) Employment Discrimination – Time for Filing Complaints Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0959 /CH0620 (SB0872/CH0621) Health Insurance - Consumer Protections Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1120 /CH0428 (SB0738) Health Care Providers – Discrimination in Provision of Services Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 428
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0364 (HB0579) Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0547 (HB0255) Health Care Facilities - Hospitals and Related Institutions - Discrimination Protections Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0738 (HB1120/CH0428) Health Care Providers and Health Benefit Plans - Discrimination in Provision of Services Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0872 /CH0621 (HB0959/CH0620) Health Insurance - Consumer Protections Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 621
Finance
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB1007 (HB0728) Employment Discrimination and Discriminatory Housing Practices - Time for Filing Complaints Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 12:27 PM