Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Clerks of Court

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0181 (SB0040/CH0008)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0201
Title
District Court Electronic Citation Fund and Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0377
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services Employees - Forfeiture of Retirement Benefits for Criminal Conviction
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0542 (SB0017)
Title
Family Law - Performance of Marriage Ceremonies
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0857
Title
Courts - Attorneys - Subpoena Procedures and Forms for Circuit Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0999 /CH0106
Title
Code Revision - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1171
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Correctional, Police, and Law Enforcement Officers - Forfeiture of Retirement Benefits for Criminal Conviction
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1186
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1245 (SB0922/CH0205)
Title
Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1328 (SB0865/CH0567)
Title
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1449
Title
Criminal Procedure - Marijuana Diversion Program
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0017 (HB0542)
Title
Family Law - Performance of Marriage Ceremonies
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0040 /CH0008 (HB0181)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0319
Title
Elected Offices - Filling of Vacancies - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438 /CH0501
Title
Municipal Elections - Inclusion of Offices and Questions on the State Ballot
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0865 /CH0567 (HB1328)
Title
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member Rights
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0922 /CH0205 (HB1245)
Title
Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic Notification
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0973 (HB1232)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and Release
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1003
Title
Business Regulation - Pet Cemeteries - Establishment and Operational Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1090
Title
Prince George's County - Circuit Court - Attorney Appearance Fee
Sponsor
Prince George's County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0181 (SB0040/CH0008) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0201 District Court Electronic Citation Fund and Fee Delegate Mitchell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0235 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0377 State Retirement and Pension System - Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services Employees - Forfeiture of Retirement Benefits for Criminal Conviction Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0542 (SB0017) Family Law - Performance of Marriage Ceremonies Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0857 Courts - Attorneys - Subpoena Procedures and Forms for Circuit Courts Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0999 /CH0106 Code Revision - Miscellaneous Provisions Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1171 State Retirement and Pension System - Correctional, Police, and Law Enforcement Officers - Forfeiture of Retirement Benefits for Criminal Conviction Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1186 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2014 - 3:30 PM
HB1245 (SB0922/CH0205) Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic Notification Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1328 (SB0865/CH0567) Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member Rights Delegate Swain 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environmental Matters
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1449 Criminal Procedure - Marijuana Diversion Program Delegate Jones 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0017 (HB0542) Family Law - Performance of Marriage Ceremonies Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0040 /CH0008 (HB0181) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2014 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0319 Elected Offices - Filling of Vacancies - Procedures Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0438 /CH0501 Municipal Elections - Inclusion of Offices and Questions on the State Ballot Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0865 /CH0567 (HB1328) Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member Rights Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0922 /CH0205 (HB1245) Crime Victim and Crime Victim's Representative - Electronic Notification Senator Stone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0973 (HB1232) Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and Release Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (37-9)
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1003 Business Regulation - Pet Cemeteries - Establishment and Operational Requirements Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1090 Prince George's County - Circuit Court - Attorney Appearance Fee Prince George's County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM