Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Clerks of Court

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0043
Title
Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0046
Title
Baltimore City - Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0404 /CH0425 (SB0234)
Title
St. Mary's County - Land Records - Repeal
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0484 (SB0861)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0523 /CH0814 (SB0119)
Title
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems and Vaping Liquid - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0799
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0864 (SB1047)
Title
Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939 (SB0747)
Title
State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and Notarizations
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0941 /CH0410 (SB0631)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1191 (SB0378)
Title
Clerk of Court - Prohibition Against Ruling
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0002 /CH0512
Title
Maryland Heritage Areas Authority - Revision of Boundaries and Boundary Maps
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0119 (HB0523/CH0814)
Title
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - Licensing
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 (HB0404/CH0425)
Title
St. Mary's County - Land Records - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0376 /CH0521 (HB0595/CH0520)
Title
Mortgages and Deeds of Trust - Prerequisites to Recording
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0378 (HB1191)
Title
Clerk of Court - Prohibition Against Ruling
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0631 (HB0941/CH0410)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0747 (HB0939)
Title
State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and Notarizations
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB0484)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0922
Title
Business Regulation - State Junk Licenses and Trader's Licenses - Applicants
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1047 (HB0864)
Title
Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0043 Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0046 Baltimore City - Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0404 /CH0425 (SB0234) St. Mary's County - Land Records - Repeal St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0484 (SB0861) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0523 /CH0814 (SB0119) Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems and Vaping Liquid - Licensing Delegate Jameson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 814
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0799 Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0864 (SB1047) Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0939 (SB0747) State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and Notarizations Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0941 /CH0410 (SB0631) Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - Establishment Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1191 (SB0378) Clerk of Court - Prohibition Against Ruling Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0002 /CH0512 Maryland Heritage Areas Authority - Revision of Boundaries and Boundary Maps Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Finance
1/17/2017 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0119 (HB0523/CH0814) Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - Licensing Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0234 (HB0404/CH0425) St. Mary's County - Land Records - Repeal Senator Waugh 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0376 /CH0521 (HB0595/CH0520) Mortgages and Deeds of Trust - Prerequisites to Recording Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0378 (HB1191) Clerk of Court - Prohibition Against Ruling Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0631 (HB0941/CH0410) Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - Establishment Senator Madaleno 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0747 (HB0939) State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and Notarizations Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0861 (HB0484) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0922 Business Regulation - State Junk Licenses and Trader's Licenses - Applicants Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB1047 (HB0864) Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM