Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Clinics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0105
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Pregnancy Aid Center
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0312 /CH0457 (SB0334/CH0456)
Title
Mammograms - Dense Breast Tissue - Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096 /CH0401 (SB0672)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1116 (SB0509)
Title
Cosmetic Surgery - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1237 (SB0139/CH0184)
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Prescription Drug or Device Dispensing - Medical Facilities or Clinics That Specialize in Treatment Reimbursable Through Workers' Compensation Insurance
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270
Title
Health Care Facilities and Pharmacies - Sale of Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1310 (SB0834)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0139 /CH0184 (HB1237)
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Prescription Drug or Device Dispensing - Medical Facilities or Clinics That Specialize in Treatment Reimbursable Through Workers' Compensation Insurance
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0334 /CH0456 (HB0312/CH0457)
Title
Mammograms - Dense Breast Tissue - Notification
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509 (HB1116)
Title
Cosmetic Surgery - Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0672 (HB1096/CH0401)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Senator Conway
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0693
Title
Health - Certified Nurse-Midwives and Freestanding Birthing Centers - Certificate of Need and Practice Privileges
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0105 Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Pregnancy Aid Center Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 9:00 AM
HB0312 /CH0457 (SB0334/CH0456) Mammograms - Dense Breast Tissue - Notification Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1096 /CH0401 (SB0672) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Delegate Hammen 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1116 (SB0509) Cosmetic Surgery - Regulation Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1237 (SB0139/CH0184) Health Care Practitioners - Prescription Drug or Device Dispensing - Medical Facilities or Clinics That Specialize in Treatment Reimbursable Through Workers' Compensation Insurance Delegate Bromwell 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1270 Health Care Facilities and Pharmacies - Sale of Tobacco Products - Prohibition Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1310 (SB0834) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0139 /CH0184 (HB1237) Health Care Practitioners - Prescription Drug or Device Dispensing - Medical Facilities or Clinics That Specialize in Treatment Reimbursable Through Workers' Compensation Insurance Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0334 /CH0456 (HB0312/CH0457) Mammograms - Dense Breast Tissue - Notification Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Finance
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0509 (HB1116) Cosmetic Surgery - Regulation Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0672 (HB1096/CH0401) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Senator Conway 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0693 Health - Certified Nurse-Midwives and Freestanding Birthing Centers - Certificate of Need and Practice Privileges Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM