Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Clinics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0327 /CH0240
Title
Health - Ambulatory Surgical Facility - Definitions
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0422 (SB0717)
Title
Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers and Physician Assistants - Reports to the Board of Physicians
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547
Title
Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766 (SB0421)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Authority - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0945 (SB0626/CH0044)
Title
Registered Nurses - Local Health Departments - Requirements for Personally Preparing and Dispensing Drugs and Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0961 (SB0511)
Title
Women's Late-Term Pregnancy Health Act
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0976
Title
Task Force to Study the Impact of Methadone Clinics on Surrounding Communities and Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990 (SB0834)
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1173 (SB0807)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Certified Community Behavioral Health Clinic Demonstration Program - Grant Application
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0421 (HB0766)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Authority - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511 (HB0961)
Title
Women's Late-Term Pregnancy Health Act
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0596 /CH0041
Title
Health Care Facilities - Surveys, Inspections, and External Reviews
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0626 /CH0044 (HB0945)
Title
Registered Nurses - Local Health Departments - Requirements for Personally Preparing and Dispensing Drugs and Devices
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0717 (HB0422)
Title
Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers and Physician Assistants - Reports to the Board of Physicians
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0757 /CH0381
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Required Disclosures
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0807 (HB1173)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Certified Community Behavioral Health Clinic Demonstration Program - Grant Application
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0834 (HB0990)
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - Standards
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0327 /CH0240 Health - Ambulatory Surgical Facility - Definitions Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0422 (SB0717) Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers and Physician Assistants - Reports to the Board of Physicians Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0547 Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015 Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0766 (SB0421) State Board of Dental Examiners - Authority - Exemptions Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0945 (SB0626/CH0044) Registered Nurses - Local Health Departments - Requirements for Personally Preparing and Dispensing Drugs and Devices Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0961 (SB0511) Women's Late-Term Pregnancy Health Act Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0976 Task Force to Study the Impact of Methadone Clinics on Surrounding Communities and Businesses Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0990 (SB0834) Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - Standards Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1173 (SB0807) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Certified Community Behavioral Health Clinic Demonstration Program - Grant Application Delegate Hammen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0421 (HB0766) State Board of Dental Examiners - Authority - Exemptions Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0511 (HB0961) Women's Late-Term Pregnancy Health Act Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0596 /CH0041 Health Care Facilities - Surveys, Inspections, and External Reviews Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0626 /CH0044 (HB0945) Registered Nurses - Local Health Departments - Requirements for Personally Preparing and Dispensing Drugs and Devices Senator Montgomery 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0717 (HB0422) Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers and Physician Assistants - Reports to the Board of Physicians Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0757 /CH0381 Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Required Disclosures Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0807 (HB1173) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Certified Community Behavioral Health Clinic Demonstration Program - Grant Application Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0834 (HB0990) Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - Standards Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM