Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Clinics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0034
Title
Criminal Law - Illegal Distribution of Controlled Dangerous Substance Near Methadone Clinic - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 (SB0791)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Health Care for the Homeless Dental Clinic
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0437 /CH0147 (SB0537)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0752 /CH0116 (SB0647)
Title
Physicians - Prescriptions Written by Physician Assistants or Nurse Practitioners - Preparing and Dispensing
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1283 (SB0228)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1468
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0228 (HB1283)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0537 (HB0437/CH0147)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0647 (HB0752/CH0116)
Title
Physicians - Prescriptions Written by Physician Assistants or Nurse Practitioners - Preparing and Dispensing
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB0407)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Health Care for the Homeless Dental Clinic
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1136 /CH0472
Title
Regulation of Radiation Sources - Fee - Exemption for Pro Bono Temporary Dental Clinics
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0034 Criminal Law - Illegal Distribution of Controlled Dangerous Substance Near Methadone Clinic - Penalties Delegate Cassilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0407 (SB0791) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Health Care for the Homeless Dental Clinic Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0437 /CH0147 (SB0537) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0752 /CH0116 (SB0647) Physicians - Prescriptions Written by Physician Assistants or Nurse Practitioners - Preparing and Dispensing Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1283 (SB0228) State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental Practice Delegate Oaks 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1468 State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental Practice Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0228 (HB1283) State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental Practice Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0537 (HB0437/CH0147) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0647 (HB0752/CH0116) Physicians - Prescriptions Written by Physician Assistants or Nurse Practitioners - Preparing and Dispensing Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0791 (HB0407) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Health Care for the Homeless Dental Clinic Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 10:00 AM
SB1136 /CH0472 Regulation of Radiation Sources - Fee - Exemption for Pro Bono Temporary Dental Clinics Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM
Click to return on the top page