Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Clinics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139 (SB0135)
Title
Public Health – Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0332 /CH0540 (SB0158)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0455
Title
Physicians - Discipline - Procedures and Effects
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0630 (SB0420)
Title
Health - Abortions - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0868 (SB0459)
Title
Medical Records – Compulsory Process Requests – Advisory Protocol and Voluntary Training Webinar
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122 /CH0481
Title
Behavioral Health Programs – Outpatient Mental Health Centers – Medical Directors
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0135 (HB0139)
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0158 (HB0332/CH0540)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0372
Title
Physicians - Discipline - Procedures and Effects
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0420 (HB0630)
Title
Health - Abortions - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0459 (HB0868)
Title
Medical Records – Compulsory Process Requests – Advisory Protocol and Voluntary Training Webinar
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538
Title
Health - Hospital-Based Facilities - Disclosure of Facility Fees
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0139 (SB0135) Public Health – Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0332 /CH0540 (SB0158) Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program Delegate McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0455 Physicians - Discipline - Procedures and Effects Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0630 (SB0420) Health - Abortions - Reporting Requirements Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0868 (SB0459) Medical Records – Compulsory Process Requests – Advisory Protocol and Voluntary Training Webinar Delegate Barron 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1122 /CH0481 Behavioral Health Programs – Outpatient Mental Health Centers – Medical Directors Delegate Hornberger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2019 - 3:00 PM
Finance
SB0135 (HB0139) Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Site Program Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0158 (HB0332/CH0540) Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program Senator Guzzone 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0372 Physicians - Discipline - Procedures and Effects Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0420 (HB0630) Health - Abortions - Reporting Requirements Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0459 (HB0868) Medical Records – Compulsory Process Requests – Advisory Protocol and Voluntary Training Webinar Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0538 Health - Hospital-Based Facilities - Disclosure of Facility Fees Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:20 PM