Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Coal

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0011
Title
Maryland-Mined Coal Tax Credit - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0451 (SB0310)
Title
Garrett County - Coal Combustion By-Products - Storage
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0310 (HB0451)
Title
Garrett County - Coal Combustion By-Products - Storage
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0011 Maryland-Mined Coal Tax Credit - Repeal Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0451 (SB0310) Garrett County - Coal Combustion By-Products - Storage Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0310 (HB0451) Garrett County - Coal Combustion By-Products - Storage Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM