Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Coal

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553 (SB0730)
Title
Environment - Sale and Application of Coal Tar Pavement Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0919 (SB0902)
Title
Coal - Tax Credits and Exemption - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 (SB0865)
Title
Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Credit for Purchase of Maryland-Mined Coal - Extension
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1543 (SB0912)
Title
Environment – Climate Crisis and Education Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0730 (HB0553)
Title
Environment - Sale and Application of Coal Tar Pavement Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0865 (HB0969)
Title
Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Credit for Purchase of Maryland-Mined Coal - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0902 (HB0919)
Title
Coal – Tax Credits and Exemption – Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912 (HB1543)
Title
Environment - Climate Crisis and Education Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0553 (SB0730) Environment - Sale and Application of Coal Tar Pavement Products - Prohibition Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0919 (SB0902) Coal - Tax Credits and Exemption - Repeal Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0969 (SB0865) Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Credit for Purchase of Maryland-Mined Coal - Extension Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1543 (SB0912) Environment – Climate Crisis and Education Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Economic Matters
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0730 (HB0553) Environment - Sale and Application of Coal Tar Pavement Products - Prohibition Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0865 (HB0969) Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Credit for Purchase of Maryland-Mined Coal - Extension Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0902 (HB0919) Coal – Tax Credits and Exemption – Repeal Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0912 (HB1543) Environment - Climate Crisis and Education Act Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/14/2020 11:01 AM