Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Coastal Bays

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0400 (SB0364)
Title
Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and Grazing
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800 (SB0524/CH0492)
Title
Wetlands and Riparian Rights - Licenses and Permits for Nonwater-Dependent Projects on State or Private Wetlands
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0996 (SB0895)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Artificial Reef Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0364 (HB0400)
Title
Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and Grazing
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0500
Title
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Nitrogen Removal Technology - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0524 /CH0492 (HB0800)
Title
Wetlands and Riparian Rights - Licenses and Permits for Nonwater-Dependent Projects on State or Private Wetlands
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0895 (HB0996)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Artificial Reef Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1008
Title
Sewage Sludge Utilization Permits - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Judicial Review
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0400 (SB0364) Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and Grazing Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0800 (SB0524/CH0492) Wetlands and Riparian Rights - Licenses and Permits for Nonwater-Dependent Projects on State or Private Wetlands Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0996 (SB0895) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Artificial Reef Initiative Delegate Rudolph 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 11:00 AM
SB0364 (HB0400) Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and Grazing Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0500 Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Nitrogen Removal Technology - Prohibition Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0524 /CH0492 (HB0800) Wetlands and Riparian Rights - Licenses and Permits for Nonwater-Dependent Projects on State or Private Wetlands Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0895 (HB0996) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Artificial Reef Initiative Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 3:00 PM
SB1008 Sewage Sludge Utilization Permits - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Judicial Review Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM